U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Ullrich v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Supplement]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 29, 2017: [Bifurcate]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • May 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2017: [Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • February 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 31, 2017: [Request]
  • January 31, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.