U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Barnett v. Kit Homebuilders West, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 24, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 31, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 18, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.