U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Morris et al v. West Hayden Estates First Addition Homeowners Association, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 17, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2019: [Strike]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 28, 2018: [Strike]
  • December 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • December 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 07, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • December 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2018: [Permanent Injunction]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Jury Verdict]
  • November 01, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2018: [Jury Notes]
  • November 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • October 24, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • October 24, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • October 23, 2018: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • October 23, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • October 22, 2018: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • October 22, 2018: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 15, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 08, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • October 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • September 20, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 20, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Statement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 26, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 19, 2017: [Compel]
  • December 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2017: [Counterclaim]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 14, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 09, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.