U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Kucirek v. Jared et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Release of Bond Obligation]
  • June 21, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 17, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Taxation of Costs]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • May 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 17, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Taxation of Costs]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Notes]
  • May 03, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
  • May 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2019: [Special Verdict Form]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 29, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 26, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 18, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 16, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 09, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • April 09, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 09, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Trial Brief]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Declaration]
  • February 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 22, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 20, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 19, 2017: [Errata]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.