U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00029
  • Case Name: APPLIED MATERIALS INC v. INTERIOR SYSTEMS INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2018: [Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [In Limine]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 11, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • July 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 15, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 26, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 25, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 13, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 12, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 31, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.