U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Davis v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 20, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.