U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Franco v. Easter Seals-Goodwill Northern Rocky Mountain, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 23, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 03, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 26, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.