U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Norman v. Greenhurst Nursery and Garden Center, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • March 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 01, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Status Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Stay]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.