U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Paddock v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 04, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 20, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Receipt]
  • January 25, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.