U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00036
  • Case Name: QBE Insurance Company v. 3K Ranch, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.