U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Atcheson v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • April 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 27, 2017: [Stay]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • January 26, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.