U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00039
  • Case Name: BIONDO v. KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • March 31, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 26, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.