U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Western Heritage Insurance Co. v. Slinger et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 22, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Status Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 28, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 08, 2017: [Declaration]
  • June 08, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • April 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Status Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • February 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.