U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Jeffery v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • October 13, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 06, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Appellants Brief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 06, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
April, 2017
  • April 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 31, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 31, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 28, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 28, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 28, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.