U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Fairchild et al v. Powell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.