U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Williams v. Bonneville County Prosecuting Attorney
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.