U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Russell v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 01, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • February 01, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.