U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Madison Nampa LLC v. Mattress Firm, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Witness List]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [In Limine]
  • May 02, 2018: [Vacate]
  • May 02, 2018: [Expedite]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Exclude]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 04, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: [Certificate of Compliance]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Errata]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Quash]
  • February 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2017: [Errata]
  • February 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 07, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.