U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Buss v. Carolyn Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 01, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • May 01, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 01, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.