U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Howell v. Portneuf Medical Center, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2018: [Report of Mediation]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 06, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • August 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 09, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 09, 2017: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • February 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.