U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 01, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.