U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Larson v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 22, 2019: [Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Produce]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Reopening Case]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2017: [Stay]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.