U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Law Property Management, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 22, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 14, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • January 14, 2019: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Errata]
  • January 07, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • December 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Strike]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 30, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 29, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • November 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 21, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 27, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 06, 2018: [Compel]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Docket Entry Order to File Lodged Document]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 17, 2018: [Compel]
  • January 17, 2018: [Disclosure]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 02, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.