U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Tibbitts v. Page
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Recusal]
  • June 26, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 16, 2017: [Receipt]
  • February 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 16, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • February 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 02, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.