U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Bautista-Aguayo v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 30, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 16, 2017: [Declaration]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Request]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.