U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00059
  • Case Name: D'Ambra v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2017: [Remand]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 11, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 11, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
April, 2017
  • April 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 07, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 03, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 03, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.