U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Compel]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.