U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Williams v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 19, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • May 19, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 07, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 07, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.