U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Jennings v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 05, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 09, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 11, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Errata]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Receipt]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Stay]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.