U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00037
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Morland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 22, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 01, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 01, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.