U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00063
  • Case Name: AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC v. Talcott
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 07, 2017: [Expedite]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Strike]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stay]
  • March 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Expedite]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 09, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.