U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Plant v. Corizon Medical
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Receipt]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.