U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Gurley v. Corizon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 30, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.