U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Carr v. Holly Lane Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2017: [Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.