U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Remand to State Court]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 21, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 14, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.