U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00071
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Urbush
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Default Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.