U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Storm v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 30, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 12, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • February 16, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.