U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Bohm v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • February 16, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.