U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Wolters v. Monsanto Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order CTO]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.