U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Charboneau v. Secretary of State et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Receipt]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Disqualify Judge]
  • February 21, 2018: [Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Return Mail]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 21, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.