U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Lahti v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • August 07, 2017: [Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 11, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 11, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 21, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.