U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League v. Ness et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 18, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 18, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 03, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.