U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Martinez-Zavala v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • February 23, 2017: [Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Discovery]
  • February 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 23, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 23, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.