U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Hogue v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Request]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Joinder]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Stay]
  • September 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Issuance]
  • July 05, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 19, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 27, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.