U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Hodge v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 08, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 06, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • February 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: [Statement]
  • September 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Vacate]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • February 27, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.