U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Howell v. Zimmer US Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order CTO]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stay]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 02, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.