U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Bravo v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 07, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • June 07, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.