U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cv-00533
  • Case Name: Wolfe v Smith
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 13, 2017: [Request]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.