U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Coapland v. Telmate, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.