U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Nevil v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Return Mail]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 20, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 13, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
  • January 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2018: [Response (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Request]
  • November 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Joinder]
  • August 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Request]
  • August 04, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 24, 2017: [Service]
  • April 10, 2017: [Receipt]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 24, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 03, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 03, 2017: [Produce]
  • March 03, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.